Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRITISH SOCIETY OF DOWSERS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 AUGUST 1987 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 15 SEPTEMBER 1990, 17 MAY 1994, 22 JANUARY 2002, 22ND NOVEMBER 2005 AND 27 SEPTEMBER 2009.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ENCOURAGE AND SUPPORT THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF DOWSING AND ITS APPLICATION IN EVERY FIELD OF HUMAN INTEREST, IN SO FAR AS SUCH OBJECTS MAY BE CHARITABLE. AND THE SOCIETY SHALL HAVE THE FOLLOWING POWERS EXERCISABLE IN FURTHERANCE OF ITS SAID OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, NAMELY: (A) TO MAINTAIN A PUBLIC DOWSING INFORMATION SERVICE, INCLUDING A REGISTER OF DOWSING PRACTITIONERS AND A REGISTER OF DOWSING TUTORS. (B) TO RELIEVE COMMUNITIES, PARTICULARLY THOSE IN LESS WELL-DEVELOPED COUNTRIES WHO ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP BY REASON OF THEIR ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, ESPECIALLY IN RELATION TO WATER SUPPLIES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.