Dogfen lywodraethu THE SUSSEX BEACON
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 DECEMBER 1987, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1 NOVEMBER 1995, 4 DECEMBER 1996, 19 OCTOBER 2005, 2 JULY 2008 AND 5 NOVEMBER 2008 AND 18 NOVEMBER 2009 as amended on 29 Nov 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE PREVENTION AND CONTROL OF LIFE LIMITING ILLNESSES, TO INCLUDE, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, THE ILLNESS KNOWN AS ACQUIRED IMMUNE DEFICIENCY SYNDROME (AIDS) OR ANY RELATED HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS (HIV) ILLNESS BY PUBLIC EDUCATION AND RESEARCH INTO THE ILLNESS OR ANY RELATED ILLNESS AND BY THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF ANY SUCH RESEARCH; AND 3.2 TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM THE SAID ILLNESSES OR ANY RELATED ILLNESS INCLUDING BY SUPPORTING THE FAMILIES, RELATIVES, CLOSE FRIENDS, AND COHABITEES OF SUCH PERSONS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.