Dogfen lywodraethu THE BRISTOL SOUP RUN TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15TH DECEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 12TH FEBRUARY 1988. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 APR 1988 as amended on 26 Oct 2021 as amended on 13 Sep 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The objects of the Charity are: The prevention and relief of poverty by the provision of food, advice, support and assistance to persons in need, in particular (but not limited to) those who are homeless or at risk of becoming homeless or otherwise suffering the effects of poverty.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE BRISTOL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.