Dogfen lywodraethu RINGWOOD AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED FEBRUARY 1958 AS AMENDED 24TH FEBRUARY 1988 AND 22 MARCH 2000 as amended on 20 Apr 2020 as amended on 24 May 2022 as amended on 24 May 2022 as amended on 24 May 2022 as amended on 24 May 2022 as amended on 24 May 2022 as amended on 14 Feb 2022 as amended on 24 May 2022 as amended on 24 May 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF RINGWOOD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATION TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Maes buddion
RINGWOOD AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.