Dogfen lywodraethu ELSENHAM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/10/1969 AS AMENDED ON 08/02/1990 AS AMENDED ON 13/02/1992 AS AMENDED ON 30/11/2001 AS AMENDED ON 02/03/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ELSENHAM WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPNIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Maes buddion
ELSENHAM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.