Dogfen lywodraethu DARTFORD GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEMES OF 20 APRIL 1910, 2 INSTRUMENTS OF GOVERNMENT DATED 12 AUGUST 1946 AND ARTICLE OF GOVERNMENT DATED 2 AUGUST 1950 AS AMENDED BY ARTICLES AND INSTRUMENT OF GOVERNMENT OF 13TH NOVEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06 MAR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1)TO MAINTAIN DARTFORD GRAMMAR SCHOOL. 2)TO AWARD MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO SCHOOL STUDENTS NEEDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. 3)TO AWARD LEAVING EXHIBITIONS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, TRAINING COLLEGE FOR PERSONS INTENDING TO ENTER ANY INSTITUTION OF HIGHER TECHNICAL OR PROFESSIONAL INSTRUCTION.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.