Dogfen lywodraethu THE INDIAN MUSLIM WELFARE SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/12/1997 AS AMENDED ON 26/05/2002 AS AMENDED ON 22/03/2009 AS AMENDED ON 06/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 23/12/2012 AS AMENDED ON 15/02/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO PROMOTE HARMONY AS PREACHED AND PRACTISED BY THE INDIAN SUNNI ("DEOBANDI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT") MUSLIMS BETWEEN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS COMMUNITIES LIVING LOCALLY AND NATIONALLY. 2) TO PROVIDE/FACILITATE TRAINING, EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. 3) TO CARRY OUT CHARITABLE AND WELFARE WORK WHEREVER AND WHENEVER AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE THINK FIT. 4) TO REPRESENT THE COMMUNITY AT ALL LEVELS.
Maes buddion
LOCALLY (BATLEY & DEWSBURY, WEST YORKSHIRE) AND NATIONALLY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.