Dogfen lywodraethu ISLAMIC UNITY SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/06/1997 AS AMENDED ON 03/12/1997 AS AMENDED ON 26/10/2008 AS AMENDED ON 30/06/2013 AS AMENDED ON 25 SEP 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL AND CULTURAL COHESION WITHIN A MULTI-CULTURAL BRITAIN BASED ON ISLAMIC PRINCIPLES (IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SHIA MUSLIM SCHOOL OF THOUGHT), THROUGH EMPOWERING THE YOUTH. THE SOCIETY AIMS TO DO THIS BY: I. ADVANCING EDUCATION CONCERNING ISLAM THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF NON-DISCRIMINATORY AND NON-EXTREMIST PRACTICES WITHIN THE COMMUNITY AND ENCOURAGING TOLERANCE. II. PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND RECREATION OF THE YOUTH OF THE COMMUNITY. III. ASSISTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUTH THROUGH A HOLISTIC APPROACH AS DEFINED BY THE FOLLOWING KEY AREAS: 1. PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT 2. MENTAL DEVELOPMENT 3. SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT 4. EMOTIONAL DEVELOPMENT 5. SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.