Dogfen lywodraethu Citizens Advice in East Dorset and Purbeck Ltd
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 FEB 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 SEP 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 SEP 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 APR 2021 as amended on 03 Apr 2021 as amended on 07 Nov 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES.?
Maes buddion
PURBECK
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.