Dogfen lywodraethu RENEW LEEDS LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/06/2002 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2006 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 01/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/12/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WITHIN THE BOUNDARIES OF THE METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF LEEDS AND THROUGHOUT YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO :- A) PROVIDING HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES FOR PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; B) PROVIDING FOR AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF HOUSES OR HOSTELS AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; C) PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS AND TO AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF IN (1) ARRANGING OR CARRYING OUT WORKS OF IMPROVEMENT, REPAIR OR MAINTENANCE TO HOUSES OCCUPIED BY THEM, AND (2) PROVIDING CARE, SUPPORT AND/OR ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; D) PROMOTING AND PROVIDING VOCATIONAL EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND RETRAINING OF THE PUBLIC AND IMPROVING THE SKILLS OF THE WORK FORCE AND FOR THESE PURPOSES (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) : (1) BY EXAMINING THE LOCAL LABOUR MARKET AND ASSESSING KEY SKILL NEEDS, PROSPECTS FOR INCREASING LOCAL EMPLOYMENT AND THE ADEQUACY OF EXISTING TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES; (2) DEVISING POVERTY AMONGST THE UNEMPLOYED BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SETTING UP WORK EXPERIENCE PROGRAMMES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND FOR ADULTS REQUIRING NEW KNOWLEDGE, SKILLS AND TECHNICAL TRAINING; E) RELIEVING POVERTY AMONGST THE UNEMPLOYED BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SETTING UP OF SUCH PERSONS IN TRADE OR BUSINESS INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF ONGOING SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE UNTIL SUCH PERSONS ARE ABLE TO SUPPORT THEMSELVES; F) PRESERVING OR ASSISTING IN THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; G) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES; AND H) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Maes buddion
METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF LEEDS AND THROUGHOUT YORKSHIRE AND HUMBERSIDE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.