Dogfen lywodraethu CISV INTERNATIONAL LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/11/1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18/12/1998 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/10/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 09/08/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/08/2015 as amended on 16 Jul 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO FURTHER EDUCATION IN INTERNATIONAL UNDERSTANDING OF CHILDREN THROUGHOUT THE WORLD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE, RELIGION OR POLITICS SO THAT THEY MAY GROW TO MATURITY CONSCIOUS OF THEIR RESPONSIBILITIES AS HUMAN BEINGS TO DEVELOP THE INDIVIDUAL CHILD'S POTENTIAL FOR CO-OPERATION WITH OTHERS TO FURTHER RESEARCH CONTRIBUTING TO THIS WORK
Maes buddion
WORLDWIDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.