Dogfen lywodraethu PURBECK UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JULY 1999 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAY 2005, 24 JULY 2008 AND 13 MAY 2010. AS AMENDED ON 25 FEB 2020 AS AMENDED ON 21 MAY 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE AGED AND OLDER PEOPLE IN PURBECK, DORSET AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY WHO ARE NO LONGER IN FULL-TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Maes buddion
PURBECK, DORSET
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.