Dogfen lywodraethu SHARPE'S POTTERY HERITAGE AND ARTS TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 AUGUST 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19 NOVEMBER 2008 AND 15 APRIL 2009. as amended on 29 Sep 2020 as amended on 07 Oct 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The principle object of the Company is to advance the education of the public in all matters relating to the arts, crafts, cultural and industrial heritage of South Derbyshire for the benefit of the community, clients and stakeholders in particular but not exclusively, by the provision of a Museum, Pottery, Heritage & Arts Centre.
Maes buddion
SOUTH DERBYSHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.