Dogfen lywodraethu THE ASSOCIATION OF GRADUATE CAREERS ADVISORY SERVICES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22 SEP 2017 as amended on 10 Jan 2020 as amended on 11 Mar 2020 as amended on 07 Jan 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE CAREERS EDUCATION, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND GUIDANCE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WHICH SUPPORTS STUDENTS AND GRADUATES OF HIGHER EDUCATION TO MAKE WELL INFORMED TRANSITIONS, AND FULFIL THEIR PROFESSIONAL AND CAREER POTENTIAL.
Maes buddion
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE REPUBLIC OF IRELAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.