Dogfen lywodraethu AGE CONCERN SLOUGH AND BERKSHIRE EAST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/12/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/02/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14 APR 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN BERKSHIRE, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND THE UK, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE NEEDS OF OLDER PEOPLE (HEREINAFTER CALLED ‘THE AREA OF BENEFIT’).
Maes buddion
IN SLOUGH & BERKSHIRE EAST
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.