Dogfen lywodraethu THE PERFORMING RIGHT SOCIETY FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4TH JANUARY 2000, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 2ND MAY 2000, 10TH APRIL 2002, 12 JUNE 2007 AND 9 FEBRUARY 2010. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 APR 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN MUSIC AND THE APPRECIATION OF MUSIC BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE INCLUDING:- (1) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO COMPOSERS AND SONGWRITERS, PARTICULARLY THOSE RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WITH A VIEW TO ENCOURAGING THE COMPOSITION AND PERFORMANCE OF NEW MUSIC OF HIGH QUALITY (2) THE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR PRACTITIONER OF MUSIC BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO INDIVIDUALS AND EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS BY ESTABLISHING EDUCATIONAL AWARDS AND SCHOLARSHIPS AND BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES (INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MUSICAL INSTRUMENTS) (3) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCE OF HIGH QUALITY BY THE HOLDING OF CONCERTS RECITALS FESTIVALS EXHIBITIONS COMPETITIONS MEETINGS LECTURES SEMINARS AND TRAINING COURSES AND ANY OTHER EVENT/PROJECT/ASSIGNMENT CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE OBJECTS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.