Dogfen lywodraethu HUMENTUM UK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 JUN 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 SEP 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 FEB 2018 as amended on 20 Sep 2021 as amended on 10 Feb 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE WORK OF OTHER VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE, IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT RESTRICTING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN ASSISTING NON-GOVERNMENTAL ORGANISATIONS WITH THEIR CHARITABLE WORK IN THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.