Dogfen lywodraethu SHERBORNE SCHOOL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/05/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/11/2011 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 12/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/05/2014 as amended on 28 Nov 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY THE CARRYING ON IN OR NEAR SHERBORNE OF A BOARDING AND DAY SCHOOL FOR BOYS AND GIRLS AND BY INCIDENTAL AND ANCILLARY EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
IN OR NEAR SHERBORNE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.