Dogfen lywodraethu THE WILLIAM AND GRACE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 24/01/2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/01/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/03/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04/11/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS SERVING OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ROYAL LOGISTIC CORPS (THE CORPS) AND ITS PREDECESSORS AND SUCCESSORS WHO ARE INJURED WHILST UNDERTAKING OR HAVING UNDERTAKEN OR BEING TRAINED TO UNDERTAKE COUNTER-TERRORIST EXPLOSIVE ORDNANCE DEVICE AND BOMB DISPOSAL DUTIES WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS AND THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH MEMBERS OR FORMER MEMBERS INCLUDING THE DEPENDANTS OF FORMER MEMBERS WHO DIE AS A RESULT OF UNDERTAKING HAVING UNDERTAKEN OR BEING TRAINED TO UNDERTAKE SUCH DUTIES AS AFORESAID AND IF NOT REQUIRED FOR APPLICATION FOR THAT PURPOSE - 2. TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS SERVING OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE CORPS AND ITS PREDECESSORS AND SUCCESSORS OR THOSE MEMBERS OF OTHER ARMS AND SERVICES WHO ARE INJURED WHILST PROVIDING OR HAVING PROVIDED OR BEING TRAINED TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO THE TRAINED PERSONS AFORESAID AND THE DEPENDANTS OF SUCH MEMBERS OF FORMER MEMBERS INCLUDING THE DEPENDANTS OF FORMER MEMBERS WHO DIE AS A RESULT OF PROVIDING, HAVING PROVIDED OR BEING TRAINED TO PROVIDE SUCH SUPPORT AS AFORESAID AND IF NOT REQUIRED FOR APPLICATION FOR THAT PURPOSE EITHER THEN - 3. TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS SERVING OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE CORPS AND ITS PREDECESSORS AND SUCCESSORS WHO HAVE AT SOME TIME PREVIOUSLY BEEN TRAINED TO UNDERTAKE COUNTER-TERRORIST EXPLOSIVE ORDNANCE DEVICE AND BOMB DISPOSAL DUTIES AND THE DEPENDANTS OF FORMER MEMBERS WHO DIE AS A RESULT OF BEING OR HAVING BEEN TRAINED AS AFORESAID.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.