Dogfen lywodraethu VOLUNTARY IMPACT NORTHAMPTONSHIRE LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 21ST MARCH 2001 AS AMENDED ON 12 FEBRUARY 2003 BY A CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 8 DECEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 DEC 2016 as amended on 24 Feb 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREA OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND ENVIRONS AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS, AND TO SUSTAIN AND IMPROVE THE ENVIRONMENT. 2) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER VOLUNTEERS AND ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT.
Maes buddion
NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND ENVIRONS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.