Dogfen lywodraethu ARMED FORCES COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
SCHEME DATED 22/08/2002 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 06/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18 JUN 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROVISION OF A COMMON INVESTMENT FUND FOR THE INVESTMENT OF SUMS OF MONEY AND OTHER PROPERTY FROM TIME TO TIME TRANSFERRED TO THE FUND BY OR ON BEHALF OF A PARTICIPATING CHARITY; PROVIDED THAT THE PARTICIPATING CHARITIES SHALL BE ENTITLED, SUBJECT TO THE PROVISIONS OF THIS SCHEME, TO THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE FUND IN SHARES DETERMINED BY REFERENCE TO THE AMOUNT OR VALUE OF THE MONEYS OR PROPERTY TRANSFERRED TO THE FUND BY OR ON BEHALF OF EACH PARTICIPATING CHARITY AND TO THE VALUE OF THE FUND AT THE TIME OF THE TRANSFERS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.