Dogfen lywodraethu COMMUNICARE IN SOUTHAMPTON
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 JUNE 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 MARCH 2009 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 18 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED ON 18 FEB 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 MAR 2023 as amended on 04 Mar 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. The relief of hardship, distress, loneliness and isolation among the inhabitants of Southampton and the surrounding areas, enriching the quality of life of those in need through the provision of good neighbourly practical and emotional support. 2. The demonstration of the Christian Faith in Southampton and surrounding areas through practical and emotional support.
Maes buddion
SOUTHAMPTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.