Dogfen lywodraethu SRI LANKAN MUSLIM CULTURAL CENTRE (UK)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 08/12/2001 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11/04/2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 25/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 03/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 14/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 27/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11/12/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN SRI LANKA 1) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, LEISURE AND SPORTING ACTIVITIES 3) TO RELIEVE THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OR THOSE WHO ARE OTHERWISE IN CHARITABLE NEED
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM AND SRI LANKA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.