Dogfen lywodraethu DOGS FOR GOOD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/04/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/08/2015 as amended on 10 Aug 2018 as amended on 19 Jun 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The promotion of physical and mental health by interactions and relationships with appropriately trained dogs, by such means as the trustees may decide, including but not limited to the provision of training, information, advice and research.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE THE UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.