Dogfen lywodraethu CRICCIETH FAMILY CHURCH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 APR 2003 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAR 2004 AS AMENDED ON 25 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAY 2017 as amended on 18 Mar 2020 as amended on 19 May 2021 as amended on 20 Sep 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS BY ANY APPROPRIATE MEANS AS THE LEADERSHIP TEAM IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CRICCIETH ANY EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AS THE LEADERSHIP TEAM IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL DETERMINE.
Maes buddion
FOR THE INHABITANTS OF CRICCIETH.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.