Dogfen lywodraethu GRACE COMMUNITY CHURCH
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 JULY 2002 AS AMENDED 3 SEPTEMBER 2002, 1 JULY 2003, 24 JULY 2004, 4 OCTOBER 2005,16 JULY 2006 AND 17 JULY 2007.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE AIM OF THE CHURCH IS TO BRING GLORY TO GOD AND ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY STRENGTHENING THE PERSONAL FAITH AND WITNESS OF ITS MEMBERS AND BY COMMUNICATING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST TO OTHER PEOPLE IN THE LOCALITY AND BEYOND. IN PURSUING THIS AIM THE CHURCH SHALL, IN PRAYERFUL SUBMISSION TO THE AUTHORITY OF SCRIPTURE, ENDEAVOUR TO: A) PURSUE THE WORSHIP OF GOD, CENTRED ON THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE BIBLE; B) CULTIVATE A CARING FELLOWSHIP THAT ENCOURAGES AND BUILDS UP ITS MEMBERS; C) SHARE THE GOOD NEWS OF JESUS THROUGH LOCAL OUTREACH AND BY SUPPORTING MISSIONARY WORK FURTHER AFIELD; AND D) DEMONSTRATE THE LOVE OF GOD BY MEETING NEEDS IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Maes buddion
WEST MIDLANDS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.