Dogfen lywodraethu LANCASHIRE BME NETWORK LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/01/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/04/2014 as amended on 23 Mar 2021 as amended on 16 Aug 2023 as amended on 21 May 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity's Objects (''The Objects'') are: a. To advance the education of the public, primarily but not exclusively minority ethnic and deprived communities in the county of Lancashire by whatever charitable means the Board of Management think fit with the object of improving the conditions of life of the said beneficiaries. b. To provide recreational facilities in the interests of social welfare for those who have need by reason of their youth, age, disability, ethnicity, social or economic circumstances so as to improve their conditions of life.
Maes buddion
LANCASHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.