Dogfen lywodraethu SAMPHIRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/05/2004 AS AMENDED ON 09/09/2004 AS AMENDED ON 14/09/2005 AS AMENDED ON 21/09/2006 AS AMENDED ON 29/09/2009 AS AMENDED ON 23/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 29 SEP 2016
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG MIGRANT COMMUNITIES (INCLUDING THOSE WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED IMMIGRATION DETENTION) BY: 1. PROVIDING A LOCAL NETWORK GROUP THAT ENCOURAGES AND ENABLES MEMBERS OF MIGRANT COMMUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE MORE EFFECTIVELY WITH THE WIDER COMMUNITY; 2. INCREASING AND COORDINATING OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEMBERS OF MIGRANT COMMUNITIES TO ENGAGE WITH SERVICE PROVIDERS, AND TO ENABLE THOSE PROVIDERS TO ADAPT SERVICES TO ADDRESS THE NEEDS OF THAT COMMUNITY; 3. RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING MIGRANTS (INCLUDING THOSE WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED IMMIGRATION DETENTION).
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.