Dogfen lywodraethu Point Europa LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED 14 OCTOBER 2004. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03 APR 2021 as amended on 01 Nov 2023 as amended on 09 Jul 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
-THE PROVISION OF TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER EUROPEAN COUNTRIES AND IN CONJUNCTION WITH OTHER BODIES BOTH LOCAL AND NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL. -THE PROVISION OF EXCHANGE PROGRAMMES FOR SCHOOLS, COLLEGES, YOUTH AND COMMUNITY LINKS -THE PROVISION OF DONATIONS TO OTHER EDUCATIONAL CHARITIES, VOLUNTARY BODIES AND SCHOOLS TO HELP ADVANCE THE EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY’. (DONATIONS TO BE MADE AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEE BOARD AND ONLY IF POINT EUROPA IS FINANCIALLY SECURE).
Maes buddion
LOCALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY WITHIN EUROPE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.