Dogfen lywodraethu THE FRIENDS OF TOWER HAMLETS CEMETERY PARK
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/12/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 03 MAY 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 NOV 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PRESERVE, PROTECT AND MAINTAIN THE LANDSCAPE OF THE TOWER HAMLETS CEMETERY PARK AND ACKROYD DRIVE GREENLINK LOCAL NATURE RESERVE (THE "CEMETERY PARK") INCLUDING ITS MONUMENTS AND BIODIVERSITY AS A PLACE OF HISTORIC IMPORTANCE AND NATURE RESERVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR PEOPLE LIVING, WORKING OR STUDYING IN TOWER HAMLETS THROUGH PROJECTS AND ACTIVITIES PROVIDED BY THE CHARITY, AND BY PARTNERING ORGANISATIONS WHOSE AIMS ARE COMPLEMENTARY TO THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE TOWER HAMLETS CEMETERY PARK.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.