Dogfen lywodraethu THE LEEDS LIBRARY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 MAR 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 MAY 2017 as amended on 25 Jun 2022 as amended on 01 Oct 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Objects are: 10.1 the advancement of education, the diffusion of knowledge and the provision of suitable literature for persons particularly but not exclusively within the city of Leeds and the surrounding area by establishing and maintaining a library to promote the study and knowledge of literature and all artistic and scientific subjects and by providing library facilities and research facilities; 10.2 to preserve for the benefit of the public the listed building known as Nos 16 to 20 Commercial Street, Leeds LS1 6AL being a place of historical and architectural interest, value and beauty; 10.3 To advance the education of the general public in all aspects of arts, culture and/or heritage.
Maes buddion
CITY OF LEEDS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.