Dogfen lywodraethu THE NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE ROYAL GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/01/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/02/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/04/2015 as amended on 28 Feb 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1. THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND; 2. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE EDUCATION, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE ACTIVITIES (INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ARTS) OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND.
Maes buddion
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.