Dogfen lywodraethu ASSOCIATION FOR PHYSICAL EDUCATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/08/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/05/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/07/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 07/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 JUL 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF HIGH QUALITY PHYSICAL EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING CONSULTATION AND QUALIFIED ADVICE TO THE TEACHING PROFESSION, SCHOOLS AND OTHER STATUTORY OR GOVERNMENT AGENCIES.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.