Dogfen lywodraethu THE GREY FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 22/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 22/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 20/02/2012 as amended on 31 Mar 2015 as amended on 15 Mar 2018 as amended on 30 Nov 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT GREY HIGH SCHOOL AND GREY JUNIOR SCHOOL, PORT ELIZABETH, SOUTH AFRICA AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING: TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS OR BURSARIES OR PRIZES TO BE AWARDED TO PUPILS AT GREY HIGH SCHOOL AND GREY JUNIOR SCHOOL OR PERSONS INTENDING TO BECOME PUPILS AT GREY HIGH SCHOOL OR GREY JUNIOR SCHOOL; BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF GREY HIGH SCHOOL AND GREY JUNIOR SCHOOL.
Maes buddion
GREY HIGH SCHOOL AND GREY JUNIOR SCHOOL, PORT ELIZABETH, SOUTH AFRICA
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.