Dogfen lywodraethu POOLE RIGHTS ORGANISATION ON DISABILITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/06/2012 as amended on 12 Jan 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF DISABLED PEOPLE IN POOLE, BOURNEMOUTH, DORSET AND SOUTHERN ENGLAND, AND TO FURTHER THEIR INDEPENDENCE IN THE COMMUNITY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: 1A BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES WHICH FACILITATE INDEPENDENCE IN DAILY LIVING ACTIVITIES; 1B BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES WHICH ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO OBTAIN FULL RIGHTS AND PRIVILEGES AS CITIZENS; 1C BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, INFORMATION AND EDUCATION 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC AS TO THE NEEDS AND INTERESTS OF DISABLED PEOPLE
Maes buddion
POOLE, BOURNEMOUTH DORSET AND SOUTHERN ENGLAND
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.