Dogfen lywodraethu SCARISBRICK HALL TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08 MAR 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09 APR 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18 MAY 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 JUL 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 AUG 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 APR 2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 APR 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 19 IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT INCLUDING BY THE PROVISION OF BURSARIES, SCHOLARSHIPS AND OTHER GRANTS ("THE OBJECTS"."
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE SCARISBRICK, WEST LANCASHIRE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.