Dogfen lywodraethu RIGHTS & EQUALITY SANDWELL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12/07/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE COMPANY’S OBJECTS ARE PRINCIPALLY (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT:- 1.1. TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF UNLAWFUL DISCRIMINATION. TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT GROUPS UNDER EACH OF THE PROTECTED CHARACTERISTICS AS SET OUT IN THE EQUALITY ACT 2010 IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHIN AND ACROSS PUBLIC, PRIVATE, VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY SECTORS.
Maes buddion
SANDWELL WEST MIDLANDS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.