Dogfen lywodraethu PADDLERS FOR LIFE WINDERMERE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/09/2007 AS AMENDED ON 27/10/2007 AS AMENDED ON 10/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 20/02/2011 AS AMENDED ON 14/05/2012 AS AMENDED ON 24/11/2012 as amended on 06 Dec 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3. THE OBJECTS THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE: TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH FOR PERSONS FACING CANCER, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BREAST CANCER, OR PERSONS IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS WITHIN CUMBRIA AND LANCASHIRE BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION FOR PHYSICAL ACTIVITY AND RECREATION, NOTABLY DRAGON BOATING.
Maes buddion
IN CUMBRIA AND LANCASHIRE.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.