Dogfen lywodraethu Age Wessex
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 MARCH 2007 AS AMENDED ON 03 NOV 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25 FEB 2022 as amended on 03 Nov 2021 as amended on 31 Mar 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 PREVENTING OR RELIEVING THE POVERTY OF OLDER PEOPLE 2 ADVANCING EDUCATION 3 PREVENTING OR RELIEVING SICKNESS, DISEASE OR SUFFERING IN OLDER PEOPLE (WHETHER EMOTIONAL, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL) 4 PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY 5 PROMOTING THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF OLDER PEOPLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS 6 ASSISTING OLDER PEOPLE IN NEED BY REASON OF ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SOCIAL EXCLUSION OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 7 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OLDER PEOPLE AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. AREA OF BENEFIT MEANS HAMPSHIRE, ISLE OF WIGHT AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Maes buddion
HAMPSHIRE, ISLE OF WIGHT AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.