Dogfen lywodraethu GURDWARA SACHKHAND ISHER DARBAR SOCIETY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/10/2009 AS AMENDED ON 24/11/2010 AS AMENDED ON 28/01/2011 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/2012 AS AMENDED ON 16/04/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
A) TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE SIKH RELIGION TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE SIKH RELIGION. B) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE SIKH FAITH AND THE SPIRITUAL TEACHINGS OF THE SIKH RELIGION. C) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.