Dogfen lywodraethu Sanibel Foundation
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/10/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/01/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 OCT 2021 as amended on 25 Jan 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE: I) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT WELL-BEING AND POSITIVE MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PSYCHOLOGICAL THERAPY, PSYCHO-EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES, COACHING AND ASSISTANCE TO ACCESS EMPLOYMENT, EDUCATION AND TRAINING. II) THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND COACHING FOR BOXING.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.