Dogfen lywodraethu THE LAKES FLYING COMPANY LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/03/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/06/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 MAR 2016 as amended on 24 May 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY:- 1) THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF A HERITAGE CENTRE, THAT WILL TELL THE STORY OF SEAPLANES WITH THE EMPHASIS ON THE HISTORY OF THEIR EARLY DEVELOPMENT AND THEIR ACTIVITIES IN AND AROUND WINDERMERE AND THE LAKE DISTRICT; 2) THE CONSTRUCTION, DISPLAYS AND FLIGHTS OF AN AIRWORTHY REPLICA OF WATERBIRD - THE FIRST AEROPLANE TO SUCCESSFULLY TAKE OFF AND ALIGHT ON WATER OUTSIDE OF FRANCE AND THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON 25/11/1911 AT WINDERMERE; 3) EXHIBITING THE REPLICA OF WATERBIRD IN PERPETUITY; 4) PROVIDING HISTORICAL AND TECHNICAL INFORMATION REGARDING THE HISTORICAL CONTEXT AND DESIGN OF WATERBIRD.
Maes buddion
WINDERMERE AND THE LAKE DISTRICT.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.