Dogfen lywodraethu RIDE HIGH LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/09/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 FEB 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 APR 2018 as amended on 18 Jun 2019 as amended on 24 Apr 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
To act as a resource for children and young people aged between five and twenty-five who are experiencing difficulties in their daily lives by organising programmes of physical, educational and other activities as a means of: 1. Advancing in life and helping children and young people by developing their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as independent, mature and responsible individuals; 2. Advancing education; 3. Providing recreational and leisure-time activity in the interest of social welfare for people living in the area of benefit who have need by reason of poverty or social and economic circumstances and/or mental health problems arising from medical conditions with a view to improving the conditions of life for such children and young persons.
Maes buddion
MILTON KEYNES.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.