Dogfen lywodraethu KIDS IN KATHMANDU NEPAL
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/05/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 JUL 2013
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1.TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF ORPHANED AND UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 24 YEARS IN KATHMANDU NEPAL BY THE PROVISION OF CLOTHING, EQUIPMENT OR OTHER GOODS FOR DAILY LIVING. 2.TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ORPHANED AND UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 24 YEARS IN KATHMANDU NEPAL BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES WHICH ASSIST IN ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION, DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.