Dogfen lywodraethu NEWCASTLE CARERS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 DEC 2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/04/2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 04/02/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 JUL 2018 as amended on 09 Jul 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE— (A) TO RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE CARERS IN AND AROUND THE CITY OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE, PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, ADVOCACY, TRAINING, COUNSELLING, SUPPORT, FRIENDSHIP AND SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION CONCERNING CARING AMONGST CARERS, THE PUBLIC, AND PROFESSIONAL AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Maes buddion
LOCAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.