Dogfen lywodraethu SHREE GUJARATI HINDU SATSANG MANDAL,COVENTRY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/04/1973 AS AMENDED 24/11/1991, 17/4/1994, 10/8/2007 & 23/05/2010 & 05/07/12 as amended on 12 Jun 2016 as amended on 23 Nov 2019
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO PROMOTE THE HINDU RELIGION, CULTURAL, CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND EDUCATIONAL ADVANCEMENT OF THE GUJARATI HINDU COMMUNITY IN COVENTRY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS. (B) TO MAINTAIN, ERECT, FOUND AND CARRY ON IN COVENTRY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS, PLACES OF WORSHIP FOR PERSONS OF THE HINDU RELIGION. (C) TO FOSTER AND ENCOURAGE THE RELIGIOUS AND CULTURAL AND INTELLECTUAL ADVANCEMENT OF PERSONS OF THE HINDU FAITH RESIDENT IN COVENTRY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS. (D) TO PROVIDE, ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN WEEKLY AND OTHER RELIGIOUS SERVICES, ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN HINDU RELIGIOUS CLASSES AND GUJARATI LANGUAGE CLASSES. (E) TO PROVIDE FOR OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE HINDU RELIGION
Maes buddion
COVENTRY AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.