Dogfen lywodraethu NETHER EDGE NEIGHBOURHOOD GROUP
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 MAY 1973 AS AMENDED 11 SEPTEMBER 1974,5 JUNE 1974,2 MARCH 1977,18 MAY 1987 AND 20 MAY 1992.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE COMMUNITY WITHIN THE AREAS OF BRINCLIFFE, NETHER EDGE AND SHARROW OF THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND RESIDENTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TO IMPROVE THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES.
Maes buddion
BRINCLIFFE, NETHER EDGE, AND SHARROW
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.