Dogfen lywodraethu GMDN AGENCY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/03/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/06/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/07/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 22/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 FEB 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND TO RELIEVE SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY DEVELOPING AND MAINTAINING THE “GLOBAL MEDICAL DEVICE NOMENCLATURE”, A SYSTEM OF INTERNATIONALLY AGREED DESCRIPTORS USED TO IDENTIFY MEDICAL DEVICE PRODUCTS WHICH WILL MEET A GLOBAL NEED FOR IDENTIFICATION PURPOSES
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.