Dogfen lywodraethu ROTHER RESPONDERS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 APR 2013 AS AMENDED ON 06/06/2013 AS AMENDED ON 03/07/2013 AS AMENDED ON 03/06/2015 as amended on 04 Apr 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE HEALTH AMONG PERSONS IN THE ROTHER AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINED VOLUNTEER COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDERS TO ATTEND MEDICAL EMERGENCIES, AS DIRECTED BY SOUTH EAST COAST AMBULANCE SERVICE TO INCREASE THE SURVIVAL RATE OF OUT OF HOSPITAL CARDIAC ARRESTS THROUGH PLACEMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF PUBLIC ACCESS DEFIBRILLATORS IN THE ROTHER AREA TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE SUBJECT OF FIRST AID, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY OFFERING TRAINING IN CARDIOPULMONARY RESUSCITATION AND DEFIBRILLATION.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.