Dogfen lywodraethu THE INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS ASSOCIATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/11/1895 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/05/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/10/2014 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03 DEC 2016 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 MAY 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY FOSTERING THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE EDUCATIONAL STANDARDS IN INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF FELLOWSHIP AND CO-OPERATION AMONG MEMBERS, ASSOCIATES AND AFFILIATES OF THE ASSOCIATION AND THROUGH CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER BODIES WITH SIMILAR CHARITABLE OBJECTS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.